Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo de Simone

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1807Born
18 Dec 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 185446.9SelectedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
23 Mar 185547.2ConfirmedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
25 Mar 185547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
13 Dec 188981.9DiedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo de Simone
Bishop Filippo de Simone (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera e Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcri, Diocese of Bisignano
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 414
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016