Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gallo

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1810Born
15 Mar 183424.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 185545.0SelectedBishop of Avellino, Italy
23 Mar 185545.1ConfirmedBishop of Avellino, Italy
25 Mar 185545.1Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino, Italy
16 Sep 189686.6DiedBishop of Avellino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gallo (VIAF: 88836824)
Bishop Francesco Gallo (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorre Annunziata, Diocese of Nola
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016