Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Zubranić

Deceased

Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1802BornBoscanuova
13 Mar 182523.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Mar 182523.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 185351.9SelectedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
7 Apr 185452.2ConfirmedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
15 Oct 185452.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
29 Jan 185654.0SelectedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
19 Jun 185654.4ConfirmedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
15 Nov 187068.8DiedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Zubranić:
Bishop Vincenzo Zubranić (born , died ) Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 192, and Page 475

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013