Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ljudevit Ćurčija, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto

Titular Archbishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1818BornDubrovnik
1839²20.0ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
20 Dec 184123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Sep 185334.8AppointedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
19 Mar 185435.2Ordained BishopBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
4 Jun 185839.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
4 Jun 185839.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
17 Jan 185940.1SucceededBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
27 Jul 186647.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
27 Jul 186647.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
27 Jul 186647.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
1 May 188162.3ResignedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
1 May 188162.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
15 Jul 188162.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto, Egypt

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ljudevit Ćurčija (VIAF: 305797462)
Archbishop Ljudevit Ćurčija O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 88, and Page 241
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 324, and Page 505
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1854, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016