Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dario Bucciarelli, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Skopje, Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1827Born
18 Dec 186033.6AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
10 Mar 186133.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pult, Albania
14 Jun 186437.1AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
19 Feb 187850.8DiedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia

MicroData Summary for Dario Bucciarelli
Archbishop Dario Bucciarelli O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Skopje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelplanio, Diocese of Jesi, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Scutari, Diocese of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 472, and Page 505
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1861, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017