Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacobus Sereggi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of ShkodrŽ

Titular Archbishop of Cyzicus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1861BornShkodrŽ
22 Jun 188422.6Ordained PriestPriest of ShkodrŽ, Albania
7 Aug 190543.8AppointedBishop of SapŽ, Albania
29 Oct 190544.0Ordained BishopBishop of SapŽ, Albania
14 Apr 191048.4AppointedArchbishop of ShkodrŽ, Albania
14 Oct 192159.9ResignedArchbishop of ShkodrŽ, Albania
14 Oct 192159.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyzicus
11 Apr 192260.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of ShkodrŽ, Albania

MicroData Summary for Jacobus Sereggi:
Archbishop Jacobus Sereggi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of ShkodrŽ

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 331
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1905, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013