Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardin Shlaku, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pult


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1875BornShkodrė
26 Dec 189722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Jan 191034.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pult, Albania
8 Jan 191034.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
3 Apr 191034.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
31 Jan 191135.6SucceededBishop of Pult, Albania
17 Apr 197397.8DiedBishop of Pult, Albania

MicroData Summary for Bernardin Shlaku:
Bishop Bernardin Shlaku O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Pult

  • a priest for 75.3 years
  • a bishop for 63.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013