Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Marconi, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pult, Albania

Titular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1842Born
23 Dec 189048.5AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
7 May 189148.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pult, Albania
5 Jan 191168.6ResignedBishop of Pult, Albania
31 Jan 191168.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis
9 Apr 193087.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Pult, Albania

MicroData Summary for Nicola Marconi
Archbishop Nicola Marconi O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pult

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento, Italy
Ordained BishopMont Alverne

  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 472
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017