Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Mezzadri

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1867BornRocco al Porto
11 Aug 188922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lodi, Italy
2 Jul 192053.4AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
22 Aug 192053.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
23 Oct 192053.7InstalledBishop of Chioggia, Italy
8 Dec 193669.9DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Mezzadri:
Bishop Domenico Mezzadri (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013