Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Antomelli, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1863BornMazzano, Italy
1890²26.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Feb 191350.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Libia, Libya
23 Feb 191350.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
15 Jun 191350.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
10 Mar 191956.1AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
24 Mar 192461.1AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
19 Jun 192764.4DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Antomelli:
Bishop Ludovico Antomelli O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013