Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Antoine-Augustin Giustiniani, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio

Titular Bishop of Aenus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1873BornZigliara
17 Feb 192248.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio, France
17 Feb 192248.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenus
7 May 192249.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aenus
28 Sep 192350.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Antoine-Augustin Giustiniani:
Bishop Joseph-Antoine-Augustin Giustiniani O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015