Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Champavier

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1866Born
11 Jun 189225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
21 Nov 192155.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Marseille, France
21 Nov 192155.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sora
21 Dec 192155.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sora
19 Jan 192356.2AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
2 Feb 192861.3DiedBishop of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Daniel Champavier
Bishop Daniel Champavier (born , died ) Bishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pierre-de-Bressieux

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017