Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph-Benoît-Marie Martel

Deceased

Bishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1860BornSaint-Benoît
29 Jun 188524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
27 Nov 191757.2AppointedBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
2 Feb 191857.4Ordained BishopBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
17 Mar 192362.5DiedBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph-Benoît-Marie Martel:
Bishop Jean-Joseph-Benoît-Marie Martel (born , died ) Bishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013