Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Tripoli

Apostolicus Vicariatus Tripolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 22 June 1939
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Libya
  • Square Kilometers: 1,150,000 (444,187 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 365, Dahra, Tripoli, Libya
  • Telephone: (021)33.31.863
  • Fax: 33.34.696

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Libia
23 February 1913ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Libia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tripolitana
3 February 1927Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Libia Vicariate Apostolic of Tripolitana
22 June 1939Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Tripolitana Prefecture Apostolic of Misurata (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tripoli
22 June 1939Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Tripolitana Vicariate Apostolic of Tripoli

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Tripoli
194940,000380,00010.5%31311,2903011518ap1951
196930,000635,0004.7%20201,500379ap1971
198030,0001,591,0001.9%2574,2855502ap1981
199030,0003,040,0001.0%1456,0004301ap1991
199950,0004,000,0001.3%4486,2504321ap2000
200070,0004,000,0001.8%5388,7503271ap2001
200170,0004,000,0001.8%34710,0004271ap2002
200270,0004,000,0001.8%4488,7504291ap2003
200370,0004,000,0001.8%3697,7776301ap2004
200470,0004,500,0001.6%2688,7506301ap2005
2010150,0005,500,0002.7%15625,0006281ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 Apr 2013