Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Vittorino Facchinetti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tripoli, Libya

Titular Bishop of Nicius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1883Born
23 Feb 190723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
9 Mar 193652.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tripolitana, Libya
9 Mar 193652.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicius
26 Apr 193652.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicius
25 Dec 195067.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Tripoli, Libya

MicroData Summary for Camillo Vittorino Facchinetti
Bishop Camillo Vittorino Facchinetti O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tripoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorlago, Italy

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018