Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pjetėr Dema

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Apollonias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1880BornGajtan, Albania
1905²24.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 195271.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonias
20 Apr 195272.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonias
28 Jan 195574.9DiedTitular Bishop of Apollonias

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pjetėr Dema:
Bishop Pjetėr Dema (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Apollonias

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1955
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 29
  • bp/bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013