Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Primo Bianchi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania

Titular Archbishop of Cassiope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1852Born
17 Jul 189341.3AppointedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
20 Aug 189341.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
12 Jun 192270.2ResignedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
12 Jun 192270.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cassiope
19 Aug 192775.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania

MicroData Summary for Primo Bianchi
Archbishop Primo Bianchi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Durrės (Durazzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDelbinisti, Archdiocese of Durrės (Durazzo)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Shkodrė, Archdiocese of Shkodrė

  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017