Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Neviani, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sapë, Albania

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1840Born
19 Oct 186222.3ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
19 Mar 186322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
10 Jan 189352.5AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
12 Feb 189352.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sapë, Albania
12 Mar 1900³59.7ResignedBishop of Sapë, Albania
30 Mar 190059.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
1908¹67.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Sapë, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Neviani
Bishop Gabriele Neviani O.F.M. Ref. (born , died 1908) Bishop Emeritus of Sapë

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Antoine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 218, and Page 501
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast