Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Kleineidam

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Berlin

Titular Bishop of Nova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1935BornWilmersdorf
17 Dec 196025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Berlin, Germany
12 Sep 197035.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Berlin, Germany
12 Sep 197035.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova
3 Oct 197035.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova
2 Jun 198145.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Berlin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Kleineidam:
Bishop Johannes Kleineidam (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Berlin

  • a priest for 20.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015