Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernhard Huhn

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Görlitz

Titular Bishop of Tasaccora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1921BornLiegnitz
20 Dec 195332.3Ordained PriestPriest of Görlitz, Germany
13 Nov 197150.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Görlitz, Germany
13 Nov 197150.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tasaccora
11 Dec 197150.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tasaccora
28 Jun 197250.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Görlitz, Germany
27 Jun 199472.8RetiredApostolic Administrator of Görlitz, Germany
14 Sep 200786.1DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Görlitz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Huhn:
Bishop Bernhard Huhn (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Görlitz

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015