Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Müller

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Görlitz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1931BornSchmottseiffen
17 Jul 195524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Görlitz, Germany
19 May 198755.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Görlitz, Germany
19 May 198755.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
1 Jul 198756.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasai
27 Jun 199463.0AppointedBishop of Görlitz, Germany
3 Sep 199463.2InstalledBishop of Görlitz, Germany
24 Jun 200675.0RetiredBishop of Görlitz, Germany
25 Dec 201281.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Görlitz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Müller:
Bishop Rudolf Müller (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Görlitz

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2006
  • d: CB, 27 Dec 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013