Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad Zdarsa

Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1944 Born
16 Mar 197429.7Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
24 Apr 200762.8AppointedBishop of Görlitz, Germany
23 Jun 200763.0Ordained BishopBishop of Görlitz, Germany
8 Jul 201066.0AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
23 Oct 201066.3InstalledBishop of Augsburg, Germany
4 Jul 201975.0RetiredBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad Zdarsa
Bishop Konrad Zdarsa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHainichen
Ordained BishopSankt Jakobus, Cathedral, Görlitz, Diocese of Görlitz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Augsburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2007
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,437
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2010
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 1 Apr 2020

Quantcast