Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfgang Ipolt

Bishop of Görlitz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1954 BornGotha
30 Jun 197925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Erfurt, Germany
18 Jun 201157.3AppointedBishop of Görlitz, Germany
28 Aug 201157.4Ordained BishopBishop of Görlitz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Ipolt:
Bishop Wolfgang Ipolt (born ) Bishop of Görlitz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Görlitz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 9 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013