Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rainer Maria Cardinal Woelki

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Maria Vianney


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1956 BornKöln-Mühlheim
14 Jun 198528.8Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Feb 200346.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Feb 200346.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Scampa
30 Mar 200346.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scampa
2 Jul 201154.9AppointedArchbishop of Berlin, Germany
27 Aug 201155.0InstalledArchbishop of Berlin, Germany
18 Feb 201255.5Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201255.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Maria Vianney
30 Jun 201255.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Maria Vianney
11 Jul 201457.9AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
20 Sep 201458.1InstalledArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Rainer Maria Woelki:
Rainer Maria Cardinal Woelki (born ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2011
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1g30: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,360
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014
  • i: CB, 7 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014