Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Bätzing

Bishop of Limburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1961 BornKirchen
18 Jul 198726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
1 Jul 201655.2AppointedBishop of Limburg, Germany
18 Sep 201655.4Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Bätzing (VIAF: 77391200)
Bishop Georg Bätzing (born ) Bishop of Limburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2016
  • c2: CB, 5 Jul 2016
  • ob: CB, 7 Jul 2016
  • c34: CB, 22 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Sep 2016