Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard Feige

Bishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1951 BornHalle
1 Jul 197826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Magdeburg, Germany
19 Jul 199947.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Magdeburg, Germany
19 Jul 199947.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tisedi
11 Sep 199947.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tisedi
23 Feb 200553.3AppointedBishop of Magdeburg, Germany
16 Apr 200553.4InstalledBishop of Magdeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gerhard Feige:
Bishop Gerhard Feige (born ) Bishop of Magdeburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Magdeburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,609

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013