Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold Nowak

Bishop Emeritus of Magdeburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1929 BornMagdeburg
10 May 195627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
12 Feb 199060.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Magdeburg, Germany
12 Feb 199060.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissa
24 Mar 199061.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissa
27 Jun 199465.3AppointedBishop of Magdeburg, Germany
9 Oct 199465.6InstalledBishop of Magdeburg, Germany
17 Mar 200475.0RetiredBishop of Magdeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Leopold Nowak:
Bishop Leopold Nowak (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Magdeburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Magdeburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,861

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013