Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hans-Georg (Johannes) Braun

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Magdeburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1919Born
8 Aug 194828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
3 Mar 197050.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
3 Mar 197050.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena
18 Apr 197050.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena
23 Jul 197353.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Magdeburg, Germany
12 Feb 199070.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Magdeburg, Germany
17 Jul 200484.7DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Magdeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hans-Georg (Johannes) Braun
Bishop Hans-Georg (Johannes) Braun (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Magdeburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDortmund

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jul 2017