Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul Josef Cardinal Cordes

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”

Cardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Piscibus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1934 BornKirchhundem, Germany
21 Dec 196127.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
27 Oct 197541.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Naissus
27 Oct 197541.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
1 Feb 197641.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naissus
11 Mar 198045.5AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
2 Dec 199561.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naissus
2 Dec 199561.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
2 Apr 200570.6CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
21 Apr 200570.6ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
24 Nov 200773.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Piscibus
24 Nov 200773.2Elevated to Cardinal
11 May 200873.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Piscibus
7 Oct 201076.1RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”

MicroData Summary for Paul Josef Cordes:
Cardinal Paul Josef Cordes (born ) President Emeritus of “Cor Unum”

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013