Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Pachowiak

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

Titular Bishop of Phytea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1916Born
15 May 194024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
27 May 195842.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
27 May 195842.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Phytea
15 Jul 195842.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phytea
24 Aug 199276.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
22 Nov 200084.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Pachowiak
Bishop Heinrich Pachowiak (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilhelmsburg

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018