Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hans-Georg Koitz

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

Titular Bishop of Cantanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1935 BornStriegau
30 Jun 196227.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
24 Aug 199257.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
24 Aug 199257.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cantanus
25 Oct 199257.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cantanus
4 Dec 201075.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hans-Georg Koitz:
Bishop Hans-Georg Koitz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hildesheim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013