Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Schwerdtfeger

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Titular Bishop of Fussala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1948 BornHaar
5 Jun 198233.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
19 Jun 199546.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
19 Jun 199546.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fussala
23 Sep 199547.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fussala

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Schwerdtfeger:
Bishop Nikolaus Schwerdtfeger (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hildesheim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,612

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013