Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
5 Mar 1955 | Born | ||
5 Jun 1982 | 27.2 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Hildesheim, Germany |
4 Dec 2010 | 55.7 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany |
4 Dec 2010 | 55.7 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Bonusta |
26 Feb 2011 | 55.9 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Bonusta |
(VIAF: 59993964; WikiData: Q97513)
Bishop
Heinz-Günter
Bongartz
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop
of Hildesheim
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Gütersloh |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠