Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Wehr

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trier

Titular Bishop of Rusuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1892BornFaha
26 Mar 192230.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
3 Aug 195159.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trier, Germany
3 Aug 195159.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Palaestina
29 Oct 195159.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Palaestina
20 Dec 195159.8SucceededBishop of Trier, Germany
19 Nov 196674.7RetiredBishop of Trier, Germany
19 Nov 196674.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusuca
6 Nov 196775.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Matthias Wehr:
Bishop Matthias Wehr (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trier

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1951, Number 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013