Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Helmut Hermann Wittler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1913BornOsnabrück
30 Oct 193825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
22 Jul 195743.8AppointedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
2 Oct 195744.0Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
9 Sep 198773.9ResignedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
30 Dec 198774.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Helmut Hermann Wittler:
Bishop Helmut Hermann Wittler (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013