Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Albert von Rudloff

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

Titular Bishop of Busiris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1897Born
16 Mar 192427.1Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
1 Apr 195053.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
1 Apr 195053.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Busiris
24 Jun 195053.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Busiris
29 Jun 197881.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Albert von Rudloff
Bishop Johannes Albert von Rudloff (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWetzlar

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/d: CB, 15 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast