Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Keller

Deceased

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1896BornSiegen
6 Nov 192125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
19 Jul 194751.4AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
28 Oct 194751.7Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
7 Nov 196165.7DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Michael Keller:
Bishop Michael Keller (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 29 Nov 2013