Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Gleumes

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

Titular Bishop of Cissita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1897BornSankt Hubert
17 Dec 192124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
5 Oct 194851.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
5 Oct 194851.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissita
30 Nov 194851.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissita
26 Aug 195154.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Gleumes:
Bishop Heinrich Gleumes (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013