Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Pohlschneider

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aachen, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1899Born
19 Apr 192425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
30 Aug 195455.3AppointedBishop of Aachen, Germany
18 Nov 195455.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aachen, Germany
13 Dec 197475.6RetiredBishop of Aachen, Germany
7 Mar 198181.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Pohlschneider
(VIAF: 69056488; WikiData: Q107128)
Bishop Johannes Pohlschneider (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aachen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsterfeine, Diocese of Münster
Ordained BishopCathedral, Aachen, Diocese of Aachen

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1954, Number 82
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 561, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 625

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 8 Mar 2023