Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Hünermann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen

Titular Bishop of Ostracine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1886BornErkrath
5 Sep 190923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
3 Dec 193852.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany
3 Dec 193852.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ostracine
5 Feb 193952.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ostracine
14 Feb 196982.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Hünermann:
Bishop Friedrich Hünermann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013