Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Joseph van der Velden

Deceased

Bishop of Aachen, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1891Born
24 Jun 191523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
7 Sep 194352.0AppointedBishop of Aachen, Germany
10 Oct 194352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aachen, Germany
19 May 195462.7DiedBishop of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Joseph van der Velden (VIAF: 813933)
Bishop Johannes Joseph van der Velden (born , died ) Bishop of Aachen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÜbach
Ordained BishopAix-la-Chapelle

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,943, Number 66
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,467

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast