Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Joseph Sträter

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen

Titular Bishop of Caesaropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1866BornAachen-Forst
14 Mar 189124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 Jun 192256.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 Jun 192256.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
9 Jul 192256.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
16 Oct 193165.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany
15 May 193871.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Aachen, Germany
16 Mar 194376.8DiedApostolic Administrator of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann Joseph Sträter:
Bishop Hermann Joseph Sträter (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 45
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013