Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Hammels

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Soli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1868BornAachen
15 Aug 189426.5Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
14 Jan 192455.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
14 Jan 192455.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Soli
24 Feb 192456.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Soli
3 Jan 194475.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Hammels:
Bishop Josef Hammels (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015