Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Kelleter, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bethlehem, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1908Born
28 Apr 193527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
12 Mar 195042.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bethlehem, South Africa
12 Mar 195042.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sigus
29 Jun 195042.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sigus
11 Jan 195142.9AppointedBishop of Bethlehem, South Africa
5 Jul 197567.4ResignedBishop of Bethlehem, South Africa
7 Jan 199182.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Bethlehem, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Peter Kelleter
Bishop Peter Kelleter C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bethlehem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBardenburg, Germany

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018