Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hermann Wilhelm Berning

Deceased

Bishop of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1877BornLingen
10 Mar 190022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
14 Jul 191437.3AppointedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
15 Sep 191437.4AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale}
15 Sep 191437.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Schlewig-Holstein, Germany
29 Sep 191437.5Ordained BishopBishop of Osnabrück, Germany
22 Nov 192144.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale}
22 Nov 192144.6AppointedPrefect of Schlewig-Holstein, Germany
13 Aug 193053.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of North German Missions {Germania Settentrionale}
13 Aug 193053.3ResignedPrefect of Schlewig-Holstein, Germany
10 Mar 195072.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osnabrück, Germany
23 Nov 195578.6DiedBishop of Osnabrück, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann Wilhelm Berning:
Archbishop Hermann Wilhelm Berning (born , died ) Bishop of Osnabrück

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015