Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kaspar Klein

Deceased

Archbishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1865BornElben
21 Mar 189024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
30 Apr 192054.7SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
19 Jun 192054.8ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
19 Jun 192054.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Anhalt, Germany
1 Aug 192054.9Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
1 Mar 192155.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Anhalt, Germany
13 Aug 193065.0AppointedArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany
26 Jan 194175.4DiedArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Kaspar Klein:
Archbishop Kaspar Klein (born , died ) Archbishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013