Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ernst

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1863Born
2 Aug 188622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
10 Feb 191551.2SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
1 Jun 191551.5ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
26 Sep 191551.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
5 May 192864.4DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ernst
Bishop Joseph Ernst (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGroß-Algermissen

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018