Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Baaken

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

Titular Bishop of Gordus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1900BornBudberg
26 May 192323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
26 Jan 195251.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
26 Jan 195251.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gordus
25 Mar 195252.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gordus
Mar 1976³75.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
11 May 197676.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Baaken:
Bishop Heinrich Baaken (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015