Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Estanislau Arnoldo Van Melis, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1911BornZeeland, Netherlands
10 May 193625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
26 Nov 196251.7AppointedPrelate of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil
26 Nov 196251.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Polemonium
2 Feb 196351.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polemonium
26 May 197867.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Polemonium
17 Sep 198170.5AppointedBishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil
10 Feb 198775.9RetiredBishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil
23 Nov 199887.7DiedBishop Emeritus of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Estanislau Arnoldo Van Melis:
Bishop Estanislau Arnoldo Van Melis C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Luís de Montes Belos

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013