Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rubens Augusto de Souza Espínola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1928Born
8 Dec 195325.5Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil
20 Dec 198052.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil
20 Dec 198052.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bilta
19 Mar 198152.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bilta
12 Oct 198557.3AppointedBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
3 Dec 200375.4RetiredBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
28 Dec 201789.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Rubens Augusto de Souza Espínola
Bishop Rubens Augusto de Souza Espínola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paranavaí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Carlos, Diocese of São Carlos do Pinhal
Death PlaceParanavaí, Diocese of Paranavaí, Parana

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • d: CB, 28 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018